LA HB590 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the River Parishes Convention, Tourist, and Visitors District

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the River Parishes Convention, Tourist, and Visitors District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 590 FINAL PASSAGE (#465) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback