LA HB587 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Becomes HB 968.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Becomes HB 968.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to liability insurance for arborists
Title
Provides relative to liability insurance for arborists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Becomes HB 968. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported by substitute (13-0-1). |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |