LA HB587 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Community Health Worker Workforce Board (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Community Health Worker Workforce Board (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 587 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#801) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#479) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#479) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2023. |
2023-06-08 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 182. |
2023-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2023-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2023. |
2023-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023. |
2023-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0). |
2023-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |