LA HB587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 18 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 18 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Prairie Road Water District in Ouachita Parish
Title
Provides relative to the Prairie Road Water District in Ouachita Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#751) (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#364) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#364) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 18 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |