LA HB583 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the crime of false imprisonment while armed with a dangerous weapon to the list of crimes of violence
Title
Adds the crime of false imprisonment while armed with a dangerous weapon to the list of crimes of violence
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R] | Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] | Sen. Louie Bernard [R] |
Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. Heather Cloud [R] | Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 583 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1129) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 CO-AUTHORS (#866) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#418) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 CO-AUTHORS (#866) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#418) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 484. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 79, nays 21, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |