LA HB583 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals and appeals (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals and appeals (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 ADOPT (#996) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 583 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1009) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 583 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#914) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 BY JOHNS FINAL PASSAGE (#761) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#253) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 583 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1009) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 583 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#914) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 BY JOHNS FINAL PASSAGE (#761) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#253) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2019-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 365. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/19. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Johns, Morrell, and Riser. |
2019-06-04 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2019-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Dwight, Jackson, and Stefanski. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-13 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19. |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |