LA HB583 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to the casino operating contract (EG +$3,600,000 SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to the casino operating contract (EG +$3,600,000 SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-03-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18.
2018-03-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-21HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback