LA HB583 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to withdrawal of candidates (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to withdrawal of candidates (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-07 - House - House Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#231) (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2016-04-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-04-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-07HouseCalled from the calendar.
2016-04-07HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2016-03-31HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2016.
2016-03-31HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-03-30HouseReported favorably (7-2).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-04HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2016-03-04HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback