LA HB583 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Livingston Parish assessor to pay the cost of certain insurance premiums for eligible retirees of the assessor's office (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Livingston Parish assessor to pay the cost of certain insurance premiums for eligible retirees of the assessor's office (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#1398) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 583 FINAL PASSAGE (#432) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-12HouseEffective date: August 1, 2014.
2014-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 627.
2014-05-29HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2014-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2014-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2014-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2014-05-27SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-05-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-05-20SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-05-19SenateReported favorably.
2014-04-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2014-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2014-04-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2014-04-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2014.
2014-04-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-08HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2014-03-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2014-03-24HouseRead by title.
2014-03-03HousePrefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
2014-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2014-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=HB583&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=878501
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=891861
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893950
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=908521
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=914196
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=891564
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=890945
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=892011
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=878628
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=888789
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=891969
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=892359
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=894016
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=894606
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=909666
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=916905
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893868
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=908436

Bill Comments

feedback