LA HB583 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits operation of motor vehicles with after-market installed High Intensity Discharge headlights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits operation of motor vehicles with after-market installed High Intensity Discharge headlights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 583, FINAL PASSAGE (#676) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 583, FINAL PASSAGE (#263) (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-24 Effective date: August 15, 2011.
2011-06-24 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 202.
2011-06-20 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2011-06-19 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2011-06-16 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-06-16 Received from the Senate without amendments.
2011-06-16 Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-06-15 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2011-06-14 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-06-14 Rules suspended
2011-06-13 Reported favorably.
2011-05-25 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2011-05-24 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2011-05-23 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 14. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2011-05-18 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2011.
2011-05-18 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-05-17 Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2011-04-18 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
2011-04-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2011-04-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback