LA HB582 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 10/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 10/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the telecommunications tax for the deaf (EN +$4,700,000 SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the telecommunications tax for the deaf (EN +$4,700,000 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 582 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#844) (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 582 CO-AUTHORS (#748) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 582 FINAL PASSAGE (#747) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 582 AMENDMENT # 2801 BY PEACOCK HB 582 BY SMITH (#746) (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 582 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 582 CO-AUTHORS (#748) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 582 FINAL PASSAGE (#747) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 582 AMENDMENT # 2801 BY PEACOCK HB 582 BY SMITH (#746) (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 582 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Effective date: 10/01/17. |
2017-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 273. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 8. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 14. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |