LA HB582 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for election sections in the 32nd JDC
Title
Provides for election sections in the 32nd JDC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 582, FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 41 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 582, JUDICIARY (#377) (Y: 43 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 582, JUDICIARY (#377) (Y: 43 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-01 | Reported with amendments (11-4) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |