LA HB581 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the reinstatement of bail in certain cases
Title
Provides for the reinstatement of bail in certain cases
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 581, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1548) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 581, ADOPT (#1720) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 581, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1288) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 581, FINAL PASSAGE (#1198) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 581, FINAL PASSAGE (#391) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 581, ADOPT (#1720) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 581, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1288) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 581, FINAL PASSAGE (#1198) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 581, FINAL PASSAGE (#391) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-06-12 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 748. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-03 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-03 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2012-06-03 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-06-01 | Conference committee report received. | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2012. | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2012. | |
2012-06-01 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2012-05-31 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2012-05-31 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Kostelka, Morrell, and Murray. | |
2012-05-31 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2012-05-31 | House conferees appointed: Leger, Lopinto, and Brossett. | |
2012-05-30 | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/30/2012. | |
2012-05-22 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-21 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-18 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2012-04-17 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2012. | |
2012-04-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-04 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |