LA HB58 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to payment of group insurance premiums for retirees from the Cameron Parish Sheriff's Office (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to payment of group insurance premiums for retirees from the Cameron Parish Sheriff's Office (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Vote on HB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#300) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 116.
2018-05-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-04-30SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-25SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-24SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/06/18.
2018-04-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-29HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-02-09HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2018.
2018-02-07HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-02-07HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB58&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1062976
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080629
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091962
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097916
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1062981
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1066480
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080856
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082022
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092491
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083898
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091579

Bill Comments

feedback