LA HB58 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Becomes HB No. 1202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Becomes HB No. 1202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the District Attorneys' Retirement System (EG $(18,701,000) APV)
Title
Relative to the District Attorneys' Retirement System (EG $(18,701,000) APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Becomes HB No. 1202. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported by substitute (9-0) (Regular) | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-30 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |
2012-01-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-27 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB58 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=768130 |