LA HB579 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the authorization for therapeutic use of marijuana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the authorization for therapeutic use of marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 579 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1233) (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 579 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1155) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 579 FINAL PASSAGE (#945) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 579 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 54, nays 34, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-16HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2018-05-16HouseMotion to reconsider pending.
2018-05-16HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2018-05-16HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-09SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-03SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-02SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-12HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 40. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-05HouseReported with amendments (8-4).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB579&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072833
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083536
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086138
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098689
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083353
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083246
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083727
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085988
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086067
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086042
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086034
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092576
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094861
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094776
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094773
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097797
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098301
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072841
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083675
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086236
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092697
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086094
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095013

Bill Comments

feedback