LA HB577 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to promotions within certain local police departments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to promotions within certain local police departments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 577 ADOPT (#733) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 577 MOTION TO ADOPT (#765) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 577 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#707) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 577 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 577 AMENDMENT # 2238 BY WHITE HB 577 BY GOUDEAU (#566) (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 577 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 577 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 196.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-01SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Hensgens, and White.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Goudeau, Huval, and James.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (14-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB577&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163640
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170469
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179214
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181929
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177148
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177626
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178153
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178409
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163652
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170504
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178728
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186284
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173028
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173293
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177628
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178771
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179013

Bill Comments

feedback