LA HB573 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the prohibition of marketing to minors for medical products, procedures, and pharmaceuticals from state agencies (OR SEE FISC NOTE FF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the prohibition of marketing to minors for medical products, procedures, and pharmaceuticals from state agencies (OR SEE FISC NOTE FF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |