LA HB573 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date: 05/20/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date: 05/20/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows political subdivisions to perform integrated coastal projects through outcome-based contracting
Title
Allows political subdivisions to perform integrated coastal projects through outcome-based contracting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 573 FINAL PASSAGE (#768) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 573 FINAL PASSAGE (#237) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 573 FINAL PASSAGE (#237) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | House | Effective date: 05/20/2018. |
2018-05-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 393. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/18. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |