LA HB573 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes legal and consulting fees of Pilotage Fee Commission in pilotage fees and rates
Title
Includes legal and consulting fees of Pilotage Fee Commission in pilotage fees and rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |