LA HB570 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the practice of telemedicine
Title
Provides relative to the practice of telemedicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 570 ADOPT (#1229) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 570 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1147) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 570 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#834) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 570 FINAL PASSAGE (#676) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 570 FINAL PASSAGE (#408) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 570 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1147) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 570 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#834) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 570 FINAL PASSAGE (#676) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 570 FINAL PASSAGE (#408) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 06/17/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 630. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2016-05-24 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Mills, and Appel. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Schroder, Hoffmann, and Pearson. |
2016-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. |
2016-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |