LA HB57 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the salary of the commissioner of the Twenty-Second Judicial District Court (OR +$41,500 LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the salary of the commissioner of the Twenty-Second Judicial District Court (OR +$41,500 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2018-03-26 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2018. |
2018-02-05 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | House | Prefiled. |