LA HB568 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the licensing and regulation of pharmacists
Title
Provides relative to the licensing and regulation of pharmacists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 568 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#964) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 568 FINAL PASSAGE (#868) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 568 FINAL PASSAGE (#361) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 568 FINAL PASSAGE (#868) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 568 FINAL PASSAGE (#361) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 409. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |