LA HB564 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 44. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 44. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for unregulated services within the Louisiana Cosmetology Act
Title
Provides for unregulated services within the Louisiana Cosmetology Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 564 FINAL PASSAGE (#392) (Y: 44 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 564 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#391) (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 564 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#391) (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 44. Failed to pass. |
2018-04-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18. |
2018-04-10 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported with amendments (11-3). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |