LA HB564 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to motor vehicle inspections (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to motor vehicle inspections (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 564 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 33. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably (9-3). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |