LA HB562 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the allocation of expenditures of the state operating budget (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the allocation of expenditures of the state operating budget (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 562 FINAL PASSAGE (#457) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 562 FINAL PASSAGE (#134) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2020-06-12HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-28SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-26SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (18-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB562&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163568
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169193
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177376
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168735
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169179
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163607
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168589
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169209
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170581
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177867
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181946
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186944
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173070
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177160

Bill Comments

feedback