LA HB561 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides relative to the Calcasieu Parish Tolling Authority (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides relative to the Calcasieu Parish Tolling Authority (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 561 FINAL PASSAGE (#83) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |