LA HB560 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the imposition of tax on hemp and CBD (EG +$610,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the imposition of tax on hemp and CBD (EG +$610,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 560 FINAL PASSAGE (#376) (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-20HouseNotice given.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2019-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2019-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-16HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-16HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-06HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-23HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB560&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122287
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126670
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126335
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126409
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133536
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135038
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134979
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122294
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125624
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126810
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131779
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135096

Bill Comments

feedback