LA HB560 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the enforcement of privileges and liens granted in favor of a parish or municipality for costs incurred in the demolition, removal, repair, or maintenance of condemned property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the enforcement of privileges and liens granted in favor of a parish or municipality for costs incurred in the demolition, removal, repair, or maintenance of condemned property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Vote on HB 560, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1637) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 560, FINAL PASSAGE (#1544) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 560, FINAL PASSAGE (#611) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-25 Effective date: July 1, 2010.
2010-06-25 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 586.
2010-06-18 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2010-06-17 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2010-06-17 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2010-06-16 Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2010-06-15 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
2010-06-14 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2010-06-14 Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-06-03 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2010-06-02 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2010-06-01 Reported favorably.
2010-05-11 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2010-05-10 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2010-05-05 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2010-05-05 Called from the calendar.
2010-05-05 Read by title, returned to the calendar.
2010-04-29 Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010.
2010-04-26 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
2010-04-22 Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent).
2010-03-29 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2010-03-19 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
2010-03-16 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2010-03-16 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback