LA HB56 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 11/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the signs displayed at the point of purchase of any tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor product

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the signs displayed at the point of purchase of any tobacco, alternative nicotine, or vapor product

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#781) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House Vote on HB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#421) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEffective date: 11/01/2018.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 188.
2018-05-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-07SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-02SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-01SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-13HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/13/18.
2018-04-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-06HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-02-09HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2018.
2018-02-05HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-02-05HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB56&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1062612
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083870
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086413
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094169
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099044
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083534
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083851
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083990
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084793
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1062614
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083963
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086469
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1106550
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086377
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093861

Bill Comments

feedback