LA HB559 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with regard to voiding acknowledgment of paternity
Title
Provides with regard to voiding acknowledgment of paternity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 559 FINAL PASSAGE (#514) (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18. |
2018-04-10 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |