LA HB558 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain contracting entities to submit information to the legislative auditor prior to contracting with a state agency or receiving state monies (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires certain contracting entities to submit information to the legislative auditor prior to contracting with a state agency or receiving state monies (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 558 FINAL PASSAGE (#578) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016. |
2016-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2016-04-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |