LA HB556 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for court costs to implement an integrated juvenile justice information system (EN +$701,650 SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides for court costs to implement an integrated juvenile justice information system (EN +$701,650 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 23. | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-05-31 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-26 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-26 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-26 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-05-26 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-25 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/5/2011. | |
2011-05-02 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Reported with amendments (10-0-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |