LA HB552 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to authorized payroll withholdings for public employees
Title
Provides relative to authorized payroll withholdings for public employees
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Seabaugh [R] | Rep. Stuart Bishop [R] | Rep. Lance Harris [R] | Sen. Bob Hensgens [R] |
Rep. Nancy Landry [R] | Rep. Nicholas Lorusso [R] | Rep. Jeff Thompson [R] | Rep. Lenar Whitney [R] |
Sen. Conrad Appel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |