LA HB55 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Act No. 470 of the 2022 Regular Session as "The Jean and Elise Act"
Title
Designates Act No. 470 of the 2022 Regular Session as "The Jean and Elise Act"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#23) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/2024. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2024. |
2024-02-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-01 | House | Prefiled. |