LA HB55 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 9:30 am in John J. Hainkel, Jr. Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to a special taxing district in Avoyelles Parish to fund construction and operation of courtroom and related facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to a special taxing district in Avoyelles Parish to fund construction and operation of courtroom and related facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#332) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-15HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019.
2019-03-11HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-11HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback