LA HB55 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an increase in court costs in the 14th Judicial District Court (EN +$141,840 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for an increase in court costs in the 14th Judicial District Court (EN +$141,840 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#751) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 187. |
2018-05-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/18. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2018. |
2018-02-05 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | House | Prefiled. |