LA HB549 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Registration of non-motorized house boats (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Registration of non-motorized house boats (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549 ADOPT (#1387) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 549 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1387) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 549 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1344) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#1300) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#917) (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#273) (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 549 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1387) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 549 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1344) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#1300) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#917) (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#273) (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 628. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2018-05-17 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: White, Bishop, and Leopold. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Ward, and Lambert. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 11 yeas and 18 nays. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 14. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported with amendments (13-3). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |