LA HB548 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the prescribers transmit prescriptions for opioids to pharmacies electronically (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Requires that the prescribers transmit prescriptions for opioids to pharmacies electronically (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported with amendments (7-4). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |