LA HB542 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to contracts by the state Dept. of Education for English language arts and math assessments for the 2015-2016 school year (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to contracts by the state Dept. of Education for English language arts and math assessments for the 2015-2016 school year (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 542 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#961) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 542 FINAL PASSAGE (#849) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 542 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 542 FINAL PASSAGE (#849) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 542 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2015-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 342. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/10/2015. |
2015-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |