LA HB541 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the central computer monitoring system of electronic gaming devices located at certain gaming facilities (EN -$249,286 SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the central computer monitoring system of electronic gaming devices located at certain gaming facilities (EN -$249,286 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. John Illg [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 541 FINAL PASSAGE (#855) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 541 FINAL PASSAGE (#120) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 541 FINAL PASSAGE (#120) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 427. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |