LA HB536 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-06 - Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to sanctions for a lapse in required liability security (RR -$550,000 RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to sanctions for a lapse in required liability security (RR -$550,000 RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 536 FINAL PASSAGE (#844) (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-06SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-27HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-24HouseNotice given.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
2021-05-20HouseNotice given.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2021-05-12HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-11HouseReported favorably (8-3-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB536&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211826
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223176
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225490
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229622
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225518
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225453
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228405
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211842
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222645
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223705
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224833
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225196
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225496
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226115
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229712
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229506

Bill Comments

feedback