LA HB53 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 38, nays 54. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 38, nays 54. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides with respect to autonomy in making personal health care decisions
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides with respect to autonomy in making personal health care decisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 53 FINAL PASSAGE (#601) (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 38, nays 54. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (11-1-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-02-11 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/11/2022. |
2022-02-08 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-02-08 | House | Prefiled. |