LA HB53 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Becomes HB No. 727.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Becomes HB No. 727.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removes certain members from eligibility for membership in the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana and provides for a refund of employee contributions to those members (OR -$1,100,000 APV)
Title
Removes certain members from eligibility for membership in the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana and provides for a refund of employee contributions to those members (OR -$1,100,000 APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Becomes HB No. 727. |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported by substitute (7-2) (Regular) |
2013-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title. |
2013-02-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013. |
2013-02-22 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
Same As/Similar To
HB727 (Replaced by) 2013-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.