LA HB528 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a pilot program implementing a balanced calendar at certain schools (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes a pilot program implementing a balanced calendar at certain schools (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |