LA HB528 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the outcomes-based funding formula for public postsecondary education (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides relative to the outcomes-based funding formula for public postsecondary education (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |