LA HB527 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes safety, reliability, and access requirements for Transportation Network Companies (RR INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes safety, reliability, and access requirements for Transportation Network Companies (RR INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 527 FINAL PASSAGE (#348) (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 527 AMENDMENT # 2880 BY LEOPOLD MOTION TO ADOPT (#347) (Y: 20 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 527 AMENDMENT # 2868 BY LEOPOLD MOTION TO ADOPT (#346) (Y: 24 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 527 AMENDMENT # 2899 BY CARTER G. MOTION TO ADOPT (#345) (Y: 32 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2017-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 12. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-17HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-17HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17.
2017-05-11HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-10HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2017-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2017-05-01HouseReported with amendments (16-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB527&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031256
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037401
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040435
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042911
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036866
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037247
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040217
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040213
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040381
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042838
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042775
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042696
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042643
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042591
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042580
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042420
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042338
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042878
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042877
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042876
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031308
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036943
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037600
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040032
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040644
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042293
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042954
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042885

Bill Comments 750

feedback