LA HB524 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to penalties for failure to provide records of petroleum products sold
Title
Provides relative to penalties for failure to provide records of petroleum products sold
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 524 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#569) (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 524 AMENDMENT # BY RISER FINAL PASSAGE (#388) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 524 FINAL PASSAGE (#147) (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 524 AMENDMENT # BY RISER FINAL PASSAGE (#388) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 524 FINAL PASSAGE (#147) (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 53. |
2016-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 4, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2016. |
2016-03-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |