LA HB524 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Condominium Act
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Condominium Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2014-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-17 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |