LA HB522 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Calls a special election for submitting proposed constitutional amendments to the state's electors (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Calls a special election for submitting proposed constitutional amendments to the state's electors (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (7-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |